EP1986830 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECORATING WITH POWDER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/45] | DECORATING WITH POWDER MATERIAL | ||
[2015/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System S.p.A. Via Ghiarola Vecchina 73 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMORANI, Carlo, Antonio Via Radici in Monte, 175 I-42014 Castellarano (RE) / IT | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [2015/47] |
Former [2008/45] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Vellani Marchi, 20 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 07713052.4 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007IB00419 | Priority number, date | IT2006MO00058 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060058 | IT2006MO00059 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060059 | IT2006MO00060 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060060 | IT2006MO00061 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060061 | IT2006MO00135 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: IT MO20060135 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007096746 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1986830 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986830 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/04, B28B11/00, B41M1/34, B41M1/22, B41M3/00 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B41M3/006 (EP,US);
B28B11/04 (EP,KR,US);
B28B11/00 (KR);
B28B11/001 (EP,US);
B28B11/046 (EP,US);
B41M1/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | B28B11/04, B28B11/00, B41M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERZIERUNG MIT PULVERMATERIAL | [2015/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECORATING WITH POWDER MATERIAL | [2015/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DECORATION AVEC MATERIAU EN POUDRE | [2015/39] |
Former [2008/45] | VERZIERUNG MIT PULVERMATERIAL | ||
Former [2008/45] | DECORATING WITH POWDER MATERIAL | ||
Former [2008/45] | PROCEDE DE DECORATION AVEC MATERIAU EN POUDRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13188927.1 / EP2687347 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | GB | 21.02.2016 | IE | 21.02.2016 | LU | 21.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
GB | 21.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
GB | 21.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
GB | 21.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6386696 (RODI ANTON [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12,22,23,34-48 * column 2, lines 21-60; figure - * * column 4, lines 40-65 * * column 7, lines 1-42 * * column 8, lines 19-67 * * column 11, line 43 - column 12, line 25 * [Y] 4,7,13-16,38,49-58; | [YX]US2003156178 (LEHMANN UDO [DE]) [Y] 4,7,13,14,38,49-56 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0020] - [0032] - [0038] - [0040] - [0047] , [0048] , [0067] - [0076] - [0092] - [0097]; figure - * [X] 34-36; | [Y]US2004094260 (SUMMERFIELD MARTIN RAYMOND [GB]) [Y] 15,16,57,58 * paragraphs [0009] - [0018]; figure - *; | [X]DE19746174 (LEHMANN UDO DR [DE]) [X] 34-36 * page 3, lines 22-67; figure - *; | [X]EP0834784 (OCE TECH BV [NL]) [X] 34-36 * columns 2,3; figure - *; | [X]EP0097134 (MORANDI LEO OFF MEC [IT]) [X] 82,83 * column 9, lines 12-20; figure - *; | [A]EP0641008 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 46; figure - *; | [AD]WO2005025828 (MIRA DI ALGERI MARIS [IT], et al) [AD] 1-14,22,23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1593513 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,34-36 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0016]; figure - * | Examination | US3530794 |