EP2129052 - RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MULTICAST DATA DISTRIBUTION METHOD IN THE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING MULTICAST DATA FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2013/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Hitachi Communication Technologies, Ltd. 26-3, Minamiohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKARI, Masafumi c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Yoshimi c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Shinji c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | 04 /
ASAKI, Jun c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
HIKARI, Masafumi c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Yoshimi c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Shinji c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | |||
04 /
ASAKI, Jun c/o Hitachi Communication Technologies Ltd. 216 Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/49] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07713708.1 | 25.01.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007JP51176 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090618 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2129052 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129052 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | H04W72/00, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2009/49] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILUNG VON MULTICAST-DATEN FÜR EIN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/49] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MULTICAST DATA DISTRIBUTION METHOD IN THE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2013/14] | French: | SYSTèME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION ET PROCéDé DE DISTRIBUTION DE DONNéES MULTIDESTINATION POUR LEDIT SYSTèME | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/49] | RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING MULTICAST DATA FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2009/49] | SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE DONNEES MULTIDESTINATION POUR LEDIT SYSTEME | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | Translation filed | 20.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 12.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2007 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | GB | 25.01.2014 | IE | 25.01.2014 | LU | 25.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.01.2007 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GB | 25.01.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0126397 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1154660 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1406406 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH11242588 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG); | [Y]JP2002044134 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003037606 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003078563 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2004179679 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]JP2005033548 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2005101730 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2006135956 (CIT ALCATEL) |