EP1992738 - SOFTENING AGENT FOR PAPER AND METHOD FOR MAKING PAPER BY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOF CORPORATION 20-3, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAI, Tetsuya c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | 02 /
ASAKURA, Kazumichi c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Yasuyuki c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | 04 /
MATSUFUJI, Takashi c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
TAMAI, Tetsuya c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | ||
02 /
ASAKURA, Kazumichi c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Yasuyuki c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUFUJI, Takashi c/o NOF CORPORATION 1-56, Oohama-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0095 / JP | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] |
Former [2012/26] | Löfgren, Håkan Bengt Alpo, et al Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Tolan, Olivia, et al Groth & Co KB Box 6107 Birger Jarlsgatan 57B S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07714212.3 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007JP52682 | Priority number, date | JP20060038560 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006038560 | JP20060045769 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006045769 | [2008/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007094388 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992738 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992738 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/22 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
D21H21/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C233/36 (KR);
D21H17/07 (EP,KR,US);
D21H23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/11] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WEICHMACHUNGSMITTEL FÜR PAPIER UND DAVON GEBRAUCH MACHENDES PAPIERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/47] | English: | SOFTENING AGENT FOR PAPER AND METHOD FOR MAKING PAPER BY USING SAME | [2008/47] | French: | AGENT DE RAMOLLISSEMENT POUR PAPIER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER L'UTILISANT | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | Translation filed | 15.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 16.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.07.2013 | GB | 15.02.2014 | FR | 28.02.2014 | [2015/09] |
Former [2015/08] | IT | 31.07.2013 | |
FR | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | IT | 31.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0718571 (LION CORP); | [A]JP2002129497 (NOF CORP); | [A]JP2003096695 (NOF CORP); | [A]JP2004285521 (NOF CORP); | [A]JP2005068592 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) |