EP2006503 - LIQUID TANK, BREATHER DEVICE FOR THE LIQUID TANK, AND EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Diesel Motor Co., Ltd. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Kiyoshi NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO., LTD. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | 02 /
OSAKU, Yasushi NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO., LTD. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714396.4 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007JP52866 | Priority number, date | JP20060085019 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006085019 | [2008/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122846 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2006503 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2006503 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, B01D53/86, B01D53/94, F01N3/28 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B60K15/035 (EP,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N2610/01 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1406 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1466 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL, SE [2009/17] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSTANK, ENTLÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN FLÜSSIGKEITSTANK UND ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MOTOR | [2008/52] | English: | LIQUID TANK, BREATHER DEVICE FOR THE LIQUID TANK, AND EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE FOR ENGINE | [2008/52] | French: | RÉSERVOIR DE LIQUIDE, RENIFLARD POUR RÉSERVOIR DE LIQUIDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉPURATION DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2008 | Translation filed | 27.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 28.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 17.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/48] | SE | 17.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03018177 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,11-14 * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]JP2000027627 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [AD] 1,13,14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS563836U ; | [X]JPH0424820U ; | [Y]JPS61169725U ; | [Y]JPS6428319U ; | [Y]JP2000085382 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005337227 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO); | [A]JPH01148920U | by applicant | JPS563836 | JPH0424820 | JPH028138 | JP2000027627 |