EP1990828 - EXPOSURE APPARATUS, EXPOSURE METHOD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASAKA, Hiroyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07714415.2 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007JP52885 | Priority number, date | JP20060039229 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006039229 | JP20060039833 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006039833 | JP20060039927 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006039927 | [2008/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007094470 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990828 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
G03F7/70283 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70208 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/7005 (KR);
G03F7/70466 (KR);
G03F7/7055 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BELICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAUELEMENTEN | [2008/46] | English: | EXPOSURE APPARATUS, EXPOSURE METHOD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2008/46] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION, PROCÉDÉ D'EXPOSITION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU DISPOSITIF | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2008 | Translation filed | 12.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 09.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09251208 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [XP]US2006139603 (LIN BURN J [TW]) [XP] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]EP1255162 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [Y] 1,13-15,18 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2001028448 (MORI KENICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1,13-15,18 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0042] * | International search | [X]JP2003163158 (PENTAX CORP); | [Y]JPH04130710 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH10116778 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH09162110 (NIKON CORP) | by applicant | JP2001297976 | US6608681 | JP2001510577 | WO9928790 | US6235438 | US2005206850 | JPH10163099 | JPH10214783 | US6341007 | US6400441 | US6549269 | US6590634 | JP2000505958 | US5969441 | JPS6078454 | US4666273 | JPH11195602 | WO03065428 | JP2000323404 | US7116401 | JP2001513267 | US6208407 | JP2002014005 | US2002041377 | JPH0465603 | US5493403 | US5646413 | JPS6144429 | US4780617 | JPH0878313 | JPH0878314 | US6018384 | JPH08227847 | US6169602 | WO2004107011 | US2006121364 | WO9946835 | US7023610 | WO9949504 | JP2004289126 | US2004165159 | EP1420298 | WO2004055803 | WO2004057590 | WO2005029559 | US2006231206 | WO2004086468 | US2005280791 | US6952253 | WO2005059617 | WO2005059618 | WO2004019128 | US2005248856 | JPH11135400 | JPH10123692 | JP2000164504 | US6897963 | JPH08313842 | JP2004304135 | US6778257 |