EP1988336 - ILLUMINATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Mitsuo Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
BANBA, Shoichi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 03 /
UI, Kazuhisa c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 04 /
KOIKE, Teruo c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 05 /
NAGASAWA, Satoshi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 06 /
TSUKADA, Katsura c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714482.2 | 19.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007JP52956 | Priority number, date | JP20060045160 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006045160 | JP20060056282 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006056282 | JP20060060874 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006060874 | [2008/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097281 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988336 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21S8/04, F21S8/08, F21V7/20, H01L33/00, F21Y101/02, F21S2/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
F21S2/005 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21S8/04 (EP,US);
F21S8/086 (EP,US);
F21V29/75 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | F21V29/00, F21S8/04, F21S8/08, F21V7/20, H01L33/00, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR [2009/12] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/45] | English: | ILLUMINATING APPARATUS | [2008/45] | French: | APPAREIL D'ECLAIRAGE | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | Translation filed | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 23.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0125683 (HUBBELL DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2005068765 (ERTZE ENCINAS JUAN ANTONIO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5 [I] 6-8,11,12; | [Y]US2005122018 (MORRIS THOMAS M [US]) [Y] 1,5* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH01104343U ; | [Y]JPH0418771 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [Y]JPH09293411 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2002033011 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD); | [Y]JP2002313119 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2004193002 (ADVANCED DISPLAY KK); | [Y]JP2004200134 (KISHIMURA SHUNJI, et al); | [Y]JP2004259893 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2004311444 (ZEISS STIFTUNG); | [Y]JP2005347279 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) |