EP1988728 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUZE, Toshiyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
UCHIDA, Shigeru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714746.0 | 22.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007JP53248 | Priority number, date | JP20060049043 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006049043 | [2008/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007099839 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988728 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H04J11/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
H04L1/0002 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0034 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0046 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/13] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/45] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2008/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2008 | Translation filed | 18.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 25.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0249305 (BROADSTORM TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]); | [I]WO0249306 (BROADSTORM TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]); | [I]WO0249385 (BROADSTORM TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]); | [I]WO02073831 (BROADSTORM TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US], et al); | [AD]JP2004200856 (KDDI CORP); | [A]US2005129105 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US]); | International search | [A]WO2005043854 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]JP2005328519 (CIT ALCATEL) | by applicant | WO0249305 | WO0249306 | WO0249385 | WO02073831 | JP2004200856 |