EP1988067 - SINTERED CERAMIC, SLIDE PART THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2017/34] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKASAKA, Kazuyuki c/o HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD. 1380-1, Aza-Nishihara, Oaza-Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | 02 /
KAWAI, Kiyoshi c/o HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD. 1380-1, Aza-Nishihara, Oaza-Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | [2017/35] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
AKASAKA, Kazuyuki c/o HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD. 1380-1, Aza-Nishihara, Oaza-Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAI, Kiyoshi c/o HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD., 1380-1, Aza-Nishihara, Oaza-Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Andrews, Paul David, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | Watson, Craig Simon, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07714803.9 | 22.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007JP53305 | Priority number, date | JP20060048406 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006048406 | JP20060198533 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006198533 | [2008/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097402 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988067 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1988067 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, F16C33/24 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
F16C33/043 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,KR,US);
F16C33/24 (KR);
F16J15/3496 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3821 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/668 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 04.07.2008 | BA | 04.07.2008 | HR | 04.07.2008 | MK | 04.07.2008 | RS | 04.07.2008 | Title | German: | GESINTERTE KERAMIK, SCHIEBETEIL DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GESINTERTER KERAMIK | [2008/45] | English: | SINTERED CERAMIC, SLIDE PART THEREFROM, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED CERAMIC | [2008/45] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE FRITTÉE, PARTIE COULISSANTE EN CÉRAMIQUE FRITTÉE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DE LA CÉRAMIQUE FRITTÉE | [2017/10] |
Former [2008/45] | CERAMIQUE FRITTEE, PARTIE COULISSANTE EN CERAMIQUE FRITTEE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DE LA CERAMIQUE FRITTEE | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2008 | Translation filed | 04.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2007 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 22.02.2018 | LU | 22.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.02.2007 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS59131577 (EAGLE IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS60112670 (EAGLE IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS6163569 (AISIN SEIKI); | [Y]JPS6143310B ; | [X]JP3350394B |