EP2094142 - VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYUN, Kie-Tak 223-1603, Tribien Apt. Banrim-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-180 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Kyeong-Seon c/o Research Laboratory, Digital Appliance Company LG Electronics 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-shi Gyungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Jong-Kyu 101-601, Sungjin Apt. Inje-dong, Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 540-160 / KR | 04 /
CHONG, Chung-Ook 107-1509, Chungnam Apt. Igok-dong, Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-140 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Jinhyouk 104-1402, Jugong Apt. 36/4, 2220, Yeonsan-dong, Yeonju-gu Busan 611-080 / KR | 06 /
HWANG, Geunbae 105-1002, Woosung Apt. Namyang-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-091 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Youngsoo c/o Research Laboratory Digital Appliance Company LG Electronics 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-shi Gyungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | [2010/49] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
HYUN, Kie-Tak 223-1603, Tribien Apt. Banrim-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-180 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Kyeong-Seon c/o Research Laboratory, Digital Appliance Company LG Electronics 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | |||
03 /
JANG, Jong-Kyu 101-601, Sungjin Apt. Inje-dong, Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 540-160 / KR | |||
04 /
CHONG, Chung-Ook 107-1509, Chungnam Apt. Igok-dong, Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-140 / KR | |||
05 /
SHIN, Jinhyouk 104-1402, Jugong Apt. 36/4, 2220, Yeonsan-dong, Yeonju-gu Busan 611-080 / KR | |||
06 /
HWANG, Geunbae 105-1002, Woosung Apt. Namyang-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-091 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Youngsoo c/o Research Laboratory Digital Appliance Company LG Electronics 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | |||
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
HYUN, Kie-Tak 223-1603, Tribien Apt. Banrim-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-180 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Kyeong-Seon 104-1306, 358, Daedong Apt. Daebang-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-100 / KR | |||
03 /
JANG, Jong-Kyu 101-601, Sungjin Apt. Inje-dong, Suncheon-si Jeollanam-do 540-160 / KR | |||
04 /
CHONG, Chung-Ook 107-1509, Chungnam Apt. Igok-dong, Dalseo-gu Daegu 704-140 / KR | |||
05 /
SHIN, Jinhyouk 104-1402, Jugong Apt. 36/4, 2220, Yeonsan-dong, Yeonju-gu Busan 611-080 / KR | |||
06 /
HWANG, Geunbae 105-1002, Woosung Apt. Namyang-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-091 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Youngsoo 108-304, Woosung Apt. Namyang-dong, Changwon-si Gyungsangnam-do 641-091 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07715373.2 | 23.02.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007KR00957 | Priority number, date | KR20060106861 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060106861 | KR20060106862 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060106862 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008054046 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094142 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094142 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16, B04C5/26, B04C5/28 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A47L9/1641 (EP,US);
A47L9/1625 (EP,US);
A47L9/1666 (EP,US);
B04C5/13 (EP,US);
B04C5/26 (EP,US);
B04C5/28 (EP,US);
B04C2009/004 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | A47L9/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER | [2009/36] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER | [2009/36] | French: | ASPIRATEUR | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 21.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | IE | 23.02.2011 | LU | 23.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LU | 23.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LU | 23.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0135809 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 13-16* page 10, line 13 - page 12, line 7 *; | [XAY]WO02067750 (DYSON LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13-15,17 * page 7, lines 10-28 * [A] 2-4,7-12 [Y] 16; | [XAY]CN1654004 (TEK ELECTRICAL SUZHOU CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,3-10,17 * figure - * [A] 2,11,12 [Y] 13-16 | International search | [X]DE102004028677 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]); | [X]DE102005022851 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]); | [X]EP1692993 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |