EP2004545 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CHLORINE DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Postbus 9300, Velperweg 76/6824 BM 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | For:SE
Akzo Nobel Pulp and Performance Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | [2018/47] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Postbus 9300, Velperweg 76/6824 BM 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
For:SE
Akzo Nobel Pulp and Performance Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | |||
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Postbus 9300, Velperweg 76/6824 BM 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
For:SE
EKA Chemicals AB (no Street Address) 445 80 Bohus / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODRUFF, Thomas, E. 1205 Trey Ct. Marietta, Georgia 30064 / US | 02 /
CHARLES, Gary, A. 4096 Tritt Homestead Drive Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | 03 /
OLSON, Daniel, D. 1032 Fairway Valley Drive Woodstock, Georgia 30189 / US | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2014/10] | Chalk, Anthony John Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2008/52] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 07716099.2 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007SE50125 | Priority number, date | US20060790523P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 790523 P | EP20060115670 | 19.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06115670 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007117205 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004545 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004545 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01B11/02 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
C01B11/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLORDIOXID | [2008/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CHLORINE DIOXIDE | [2008/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BIOXYDE DE CHLORE | [2018/29] |
Former [2008/52] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2007 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IE | 06.03.2019 | LU | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CY | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2344346 (HARRY EVANS CYRIL) [X] 13 * page 1, column L, line 24 - line 34 * * page 2, column L, line 19 - line 65 * * figure . *; | [X]US2833624 (SPRAUER JEROME W) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 50 - line 52 * * column 2, line 17 - line 30 * * column 3, line 14 - line 18 * * column 3, line 59 - line 69 *; | [A]US4393035 (FREDETTE MAURICE C J [CA]) [A] 1-16 * column 5, line 41 - line 60 * * column 7, line 3 - line 11 ** figure 1 *; | [X]EP0850875 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,11,12 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 4, line 14 - line 15 * * page 5, line 52 - line 55 * * page 6, line 24 * * page 6, line 53 - page 7, line 5 * * figure . *; | [DA]US2003031621 (GRAVITT ALAN [US], et al) [DA] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 2 * |