EP1971834 - LOCATION AWARE CONTENT USING PRESENCE INFORMATION DATA FORMATION WITH LOCATION OBJECT (PIDF-LO) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TeleCommunication Systems, Inc. 275 West Street Suite 400 Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Don 16220 SE 9th Street Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Walker, Neville Daniel Alan Ipconsult 21A Commercial Road Swanage, Dorset BH19 1DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Walker, Neville Daniel Alan ipconsult 21A Commercial Road Swanage Dorset BH19 1DF / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Walker, Neville Daniel Alan ipconsult limited 21A Commercial Road Swanage BH19 1DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07716216.2 | 03.01.2007 | [2008/39] | WO2007US00039 | Priority number, date | US20060766227P | 02.01.2006 Original published format: US 766227 P | US20060640860 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: US 640860 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079429 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971834 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/00 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G06F16/9537 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | POSITIONSBEWUSSTER INHALT, DER PRÄSENZINFORMATIONSDATENFORMIERUNGEN MIT POSITIONSOBJEKTEN (PDIF-LO) VERWENDET | [2008/39] | English: | LOCATION AWARE CONTENT USING PRESENCE INFORMATION DATA FORMATION WITH LOCATION OBJECT (PIDF-LO) | [2008/39] | French: | CONTENU TENANT COMPTE DE L'EMPLACEMENT ET UTILISANT LE FORMAT PIDF (PRESENCE INFORMATION DATA FORMATION) AVEC L'OBJET DE L'EMPLACEMENT (LO) | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 01.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/02] | 22.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP11009206.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 22.12.2011 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ZEHUA LIU ET AL, "On querying geospatial and georeferenced metadata resources in G-Portal", PROCEEDINGS 2003 JOINT CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL LIBRARIES. JCDL 2003. HOUSTON, TX, MAY 27 - 31, 2003; [PROCEEDINGS JOINT CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL LIBRARIES], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20030531), ISBN 978-0-7695-1939-5, pages 245 - 255, XP031385721 [X] 1-15 * figure 2 * * page 247, column L - page 247, column R * * page 249, column R * * page 252, column L * | [X] - PETERSON NEUSTAR J, "A Presence-based GEOPRIV Location Object Format; rfc4119.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20051201), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015054864 [X] 1-15 * page 4 * | [A] - WINTERBOTTOM M THOMSON NORTEL H TSCHOFENIG SIEMENS J, "GEOPRIV PIDF-LO Usage Clarification, Considerations and Recommendations; draft-ietf-geopriv-pdif-lo-profile-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20050702), vol. geopriv, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015041240 [A] 1,6-10 * pages 10,11 * * pages 22,23 * | [A] - BERNERS-LEE W3C/MIT R FIELDING DAY SOFTWARE L MASINTER ADOBE SYSTEMS T, "Uniform Resource Identifier (URI): Generic Syntax; rfc3986.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20050101), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009757 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [1.1.2] * | International search | [Y]US2004064500 (KOLAR JENNIFER LYNN [US], et al); | [X]US2005213537 (INGIMUNDARSON JON I [IS], et al) | Examination | - "Portable Network Graphics (PNG) Specification (Second Edition) Information technology Computer graphics and image processing Portable Network Graphics (PNG): Functional specification. ISO/IEC 15948:2003 (E)", INTERNET CITATION, (20031110), pages 1 - 69, URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/PNG/, (20080718), XP007905245 | by applicant | US20060442254 |