EP1973986 - BIOACTIVE COMPLEX COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM Technology Licensing Office M/S 3369 College Station, TX 77843 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states THE TEXAS A & M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM Technology Licensing Office, M/S 3369 College Station, TX 77843 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORA-GUTIERREZ, Adela 8630 Easton Commons Drive, No. 106 Houston, TX 77095-3021 / US | 02 /
GURIN, Michael, H. 4132 Cove Lane, Unit A Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07716275.8 | 03.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007US00120 | Priority number, date | US20060306582 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: US 306582 | US20060530635 | 11.09.2006 Original published format: US 530635 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079443 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1973986 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K15/32 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/6615 (EP,US);
A61K36/87 (US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/40 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BIOAKTIVER KOMPLEXE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2008/40] | English: | BIOACTIVE COMPLEX COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2008/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS BIOACTIVES COMPLEXES ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 08.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/52] | 29.04.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2014 | 12.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 29.01.2013 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2009 | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2011 | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2160098 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [X] 1 * claims 1, 3 *; | [X]WO9211844 (ENZYTECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9629893 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US]) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004097472 (WEST SIMON MICHAEL [AU], et al) [A] 1-38* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5405766 (KALLURY KRISHNA M R [CA], et al); | [Y]US5609749 (YAMAUCHI TADAKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004005700 (SURBER MARK W [US], et al); | [Y]US2005003386 (BAZAN GUILLERMO C [US], et al); | [Y]US6916490 (GARVER ROBERT I [US], et al); | [Y]US2005163727 (DOYLE MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [X]US2005184275 (MORA-GUTIERREZ ADELA [US], et al); | [Y]US2005211572 (BUCK HARVEY B [US], et al); | [Y]US2005238790 (ISHIMOTO KYOKO [JP], et al) |