EP1974135 - BOLTED PRE-COMBUSTION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Oil & Gas Compression Systems, LLC 4425 Westway Park Boulevard Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Cameron International Corporation 1333 West Loop South, Suite 1700 Houston, TX 77027-9109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGGS, Thomas, C. 22602 Bobolink Circle Tomball, TX 77375 / US | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co. 7 Ferris Town Truro, Cornwall TR1 3JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07716599.1 | 12.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007US00975 | Priority number, date | US20060336729 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 336729 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007087184 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974135 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02B19/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
F02B19/1004 (EP,US);
F02B19/16 (NO);
F02M21/0281 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2009/09] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHRAUBTE VORVERBRENNUNGSKAMMER | [2008/40] | English: | BOLTED PRE-COMBUSTION CHAMBER | [2008/40] | French: | CHAMBRE DE PRÉCOMBUSTION BOULONNÉE | [2016/27] |
Former [2008/40] | CHAMBRE DE PRECOMBUSTION BOULONNEE | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1006667 (MOTOREN WERKE MANNHEIM AG) [Y] 1-15* column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE2717762 (NIPPON SOKEN) [X] 1-15 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 11; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US4256071 (CASULL DON C) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB2100341 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 5 - line 35; figure 6 *; | [X]WO8701523 (GLOTUR TRUST REG [LI]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-2 * | International search | [X]US5915351 (REGUEIRO JOSE F [US]) |