EP2106639 - FREQUENCY TRANSLATION MODULE INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZPATRICK, John, James 3903 Junco Circle Indianapolis, Indiana 46228 / US | 02 /
XIU, Lincheng 1201 Golfview Drive Apartment G Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Hays, Bertrand, et al Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Hays, Bertrand, et al Novagraaf Technologies 4, rue Général Hoche 56100 Lorient / FR | ||
Former [2009/41] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07716974.6 | 25.01.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007US01891 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008091255 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106639 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | FREQUENZÜBERSETZUNGS-MODUL-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2009/41] | English: | FREQUENCY TRANSLATION MODULE INTERFACE | [2009/41] | French: | INTERFACE DE MODULE DE TRANSPOSITION DE FRÉQUENCE | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 30.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP14158419.3 / EP2765722 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5937337 (MARRAH JEFFREY JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-9,11-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 36 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005289605 (JEON DONG W [KR]) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031]; figure - *; | [YA]WO2006065747 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 15-18; | [A]US2006225102 (JAMES THOMAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XA]US7130576 (GURANTZ ITZHAK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11,12,14-18 * column 10, line 6 - line 26; figure 12 * [A] 3,4,10,13 |