EP1984877 - TECHNIQUES FOR AUTHORIZATION OF USAGE OF A PAYMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | 06.05.2022 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL, INC. 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIEBIGER, Sara 126 Corral Trail Ellisville, MO 63011 / US | 02 /
GLUCK, Adam 47 Wood Avenue Ardsley, NY 10502 / US | 03 /
HILL, Dennis, J. 2 Rainier Court St. Paul, MO 63366 / US | 04 /
KELLY-FRANK, Carole 1517 Quail Hollow Ct. Wildwood, MO 63021 / US | 05 /
KRANZLEY, Arthur, D. 7 Laurel Hollow Road Pound Ridge, NY 10576 / US | 06 /
REANY, Robert, D. 16600 Bartlizan Dr. Wildwood, MO 63038 / US | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07717403.5 | 25.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007US61034 | Priority number, date | US20060764106P | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 764106 P | US20070626408 | 24.01.2007 Original published format: US 626408 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007090027 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984877 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, G06Q40/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUM AUTORISIEREN DER BENUTZUNG EINER BEZAHLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR AUTHORIZATION OF USAGE OF A PAYMENT DEVICE | [2008/44] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'AUTORISATION D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PAIEMENT | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/23] | 09.05.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/23] | Appeal following examination | 13.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T2506/18 | 19.09.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5819234 (SLAVIN FRED [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * abstract *; | [A]WO0002150 (WEBCARD INC [VU], et al) [A] 1-39 * abstract ** page 15, line 22 - page 16, line 28 *; | [I]US6116505 (WITHROW BENJAMIN S [US]) [I] 1-39 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 19 * * column 6, lines 5-18 * * column 7, lines 38-54 * * column 9, line 52 - column 11, line 10 * * column 11, line 63 - column 16, line 3 *; | [A]US6226624 (WATSON CRAIG J [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * abstract *; | [I]WO0143095 (INTERMEC IP CORP [US]) [I] 1-39 * abstract * * page 8, line 21 - page 12, line 5 *; | [I]US2003101096 (SUZUKI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-39 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0068] *; | [A]US2004230535 (BINDER PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-39 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0029] - [0033] - [0042] - [0045] - [0057] * | International search | [X]US2004243510 (HINDERER HARALD [DE], et al); | [X]US2004039694 (DUNN MELANIE [US], et al) | Examination | US6018717 | US6282522 | by applicant | US2003101096 | US6116505 | WO0143095 |