|
01.03.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
39 |