EP1993673 - INJECTABLE COMBINATION THERAPY FOR EYE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apellis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6400 Westwind Way Suite A Crestwood, KY 40014 / US | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Potentia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 201 East Jefferson Street, Suite 311 Louisville KY 40202 / US | ||
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Potentia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 201 East Jefferson Street, Suite 311 Louisville KY 40202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESCHATELETS, Pascal 11031 Indian Legends, 202 Louisville, Kentucky 40241 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Paul 1202 Cherokee Road, Apt. 2 Louisville, KY 40204 / US | 03 /
FRANCOIS, Cedric 201 E. Jefferson St. 312 Louisville, kentucky 40202 / US | [2017/26] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
DESCHATELETS, Pascal 11031 Indian Legends, 202 Louisville, Kentucky 40241 / US | ||
02 /
OLSON, Paul 1202 Cherokee Road Louisville, KY 40204 / US | |||
03 /
FRANCOIS, Cedric 201 E. Jefferson St. 312 Louisville, kentucky 40202 / US | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07718112.1 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US01649 | Priority number, date | US20060760974P | 19.01.2006 Original published format: US 760974 P | US20060544389 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: US 544389 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084765 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993673 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1993673 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/02, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/12, A61K9/00, A61F9/00, A61K39/00, A61K38/00, A61K49/00, A61K47/06, A61K39/395, A61K31/00, A61K38/17 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K16/28 (US);
G01N33/6872 (US);
A61F9/0008 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/507 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/01 (US);
G01N2333/4704 (US);
|
Former IPC [2008/48] | A61P27/02, A61F2/14, A61K47/06, A61K39/395, A61K38/17, A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/26] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INJIZIERBARE KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE FÜR AUGENERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/48] | English: | INJECTABLE COMBINATION THERAPY FOR EYE DISORDERS | [2008/48] | French: | TRAITEMENT COMBINATOIRE INJECTABLE DESTINE A DES TROUBLES OPHTALMIQUES | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.09.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | LT | 28.06.2017 | |
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | LT | 28.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9630046 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 8,9,34,35 * the whole document *; | [DY]US6051698 (JANJIC NEBOJSA [US], et al) [DY] 8-15,34-36 * the whole document *; | [DY]US6319897 (LAMBRIS JOHN D [US], et al) [DY] 11-16,37-39 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2005281861 (HUGHES PATRICK M [US], et al) [X] 1-10,18-36,40-65 * the whole document * [Y] 11-17,37-39; | [Y] - "Anti-VEGF Agents Useful in Age-Related Macular Degeneration", INTERNET CITATION, (20051015), URL: http://www.rsinewsrxreportingfrom.com/content.asp?myid=40&tid=365, (20070112), XP002414529 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * | [Y] - MICHELS S ET AL, "TREATMENT OF NEOVASCULAR AGE-RELATED MACULAR DEGENERATION WITH RANIBIZUMAB/LUCENTIS THERAPIE DER NEOVASKULAEREN ALTERSBEDINGTEN MAKULADEGENERATION MIT RANIBIZUMAB/LUCENTIS", KLINISCHE MONATSBLAETTER FUER AUGENHEILKUNDE, FERDINAND ENKE VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (200506), vol. 222, no. 6, ISSN 0023-2165, pages 480 - 484, XP009078844 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2005-858315 | [DY] - NG EUGENE W M ET AL, "TARGETING ANGIOGENESIS, THE UNDERLYING DISORDER IN NEOVASCULAR AGE-RELATED MACULAR DEGENERATION", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, XX, XX, (200506), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 0008-4182, pages 352 - 368, XP009078843 [DY] 1-49 * the whole document * | [Y] - MURAT V KALAYOGLU, "Emerging Treatment Strategies For Age-Related Macular Degeneration", INTERNET CITATION, (20040630), URL: http://www.medcompare.com/spotlight.asp?spotlightid=62, (20070110), XP002414528 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * | [Y] - "Anti-vascular endothelial growth factor therapy for subfoveal choroidal neovascularization secondary to age-related macular degeneration: Phase II study results", OPHTHALMOLOGY, J. B. LIPPINCOTT CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200305), vol. 110, no. 5, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 979 - 986, XP002366840 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-6420(03)00085-X | [Y] - GRAGOUDAS EVANGELOS S ET AL, "Pegaptanib for neovascular age-related macular degeneration.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 30 DEC 2004, (20041230), vol. 351, no. 27, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 2805 - 2816, XP002472472 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa042760 | [Y] - AMBATI J ET AL, "Age-related macular degeneration: Etiology, pathogenesis, and therapeutic strategies", SURVEY OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, SURVEY OF OPHTHALMOLOGY INC, XX, (2003), vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 0039-6257, pages 257 - 293, XP002341326 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6257(03)00030-4 | [Y] - ROSENFELD P, "An Update on Bevacizumab", INTERNET CITATION, (20051201), URL: http://www.revophth.com/index.asp?page=1_857.htm, (20070110), XP002414532 [Y] 1-65 * the whole document * | [Y] - MAKRIDES S C, "THERAPEUTIC INHIBITION OF THE COMPLEMENT SYSTEM", PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS INC., BALTIMORE, MD,, US, (1998), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0031-6997, pages 59 - 87, XP001055179 [Y] 11-17,37-39 * page 71, column R, paragraph 2 - page 73, column R, paragraph 2; table 5 * | [Y] - JOHNSON L V ET AL, "Complement activation and inflammatory processes in drusen formation and age related macular degeneration", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (200112), vol. 73, no. 6, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 887 - 896, XP002386744 [Y] 11-17,37-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.2001.1094 | [Y] - RAISLER B J ET AL, "Drusen complement components C3a and C5a promote choroidal neovascularization", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2005), Database accession no. PREV200600053073, XP002472473 [Y] 11-17,37-39 * abstract * | [ ] - IOVS, ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION-FOR-RESEARCH-IN-VISION-AND-OPHTHALM OLOGY; FT LAUDERDALE, FL, USA; MAY 01 -05, 2005, (2005), vol. 46, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0146-0404, page 1214 | [Y] - MORIKIS O ET AL, "Improvement of the anti-C3 activity of compstatin using rational and combinatorial approaches", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, COLCHESTER, ESSEX, GB, (200402), vol. 32, no. 1, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 28 - 32, XP002455138 [Y] 11-17,37-39 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0320028 |