30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
28.12.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] |
14.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
31.08.2012 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
20.01.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
13.01.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
30.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.11.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.11.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.05.2010 |
First examination report |
|
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
16.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
10.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|