Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8134083 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2012 | B2 | US2009205858 | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2025210 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2012 | B1 | EP2025210 | 18.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE546980T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2659695 | 12.03.2013 | C | CA2659695 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101461293B | 07.12.2011 | B | CN101461293 | 17.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2025210T | 30.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2382752T | 13.06.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1133989 | 09.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008015669 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2025210T | 31.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07718465 | 25.05.2007 | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2025210T | 29.06.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07718465 | 25.05.2007 | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | WO2007AT00254 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007140494 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090026270 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT503706B | 15.07.2011 | B1 | AT503706 | 15.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY149242 | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2025210E | 13.04.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2454841 | 27.06.2012 | C2 | RU2008152823 | 20.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG174762 | 28.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI368467B | 11.07.2012 | B | TW200814880 | 16.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | AT9732006 | 07.06.2006 |