EP2027314 - LYOCELL STAPLE FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREMPF, Christoph Stifterstrasse 24 4701 Bad Schallerbach / AT | 02 /
DÜRNBERGER, Franz Kraims 21 4861 Schörfling / AT | 03 /
UHLIR, Wolfgang Lindenweg 16 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Nemec, Harald, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2014/50] |
Former [2009/09] | Nemec, Harald, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07718467.9 | 29.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007AT00256 | Priority number, date | AT20060001015 | 14.06.2006 Original published format: AT 10152006 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007143761 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027314 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027314 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/253, D01F2/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
D01D5/253 (EP,CN,US);
D01F2/00 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LYOCELL-STAPELFASER | [2009/09] | English: | LYOCELL STAPLE FIBER | [2009/09] | French: | FIBRE TEXTILE COUPÉE LYOCELL | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2007 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BE | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | NL | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | IE | 29.05.2015 | LU | 29.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.05.2015 | ||
LU | 29.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.05.2015 | ||
LU | 29.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.05.2015 | ||
LU | 29.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 10.12.2014 | |
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 10.12.2014 | |
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001316936 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-44 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5108838 (TUNG WAE-HAI [US]) [A] * figures 4a-5a-6a-7a *; | [A]WO2004005595 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]; SCHMIDTBAUER JOSEF [AT]; SCHMIDT HEINRICH) [A] * page 4 - page 5 * | [A] - INATOMI S, "DEVELOPMENT OF A TRILOBAL CROSS-SECTION POLYNOSIC FIBER", CHEMICAL FIBERS INTERNATIONAL, IBP INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS PRESS PUBL., FRANKFURT, DE, (199904), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 0340-3343, page 117,120, XP000827382 [A] * the whole document * | Examination | WO9319230 | JPH10140429 | JPH10158924 | JPH07305219 |