EP2035578 - IDENTIFICATION OF A NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conexio 4 Pty Ltd 36 Windsor Road East Frematle, WA 6158 / AU | For all designated states Celera Corporation 1401 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Conexio 4 Pty Ltd 36 Windsor Road East Frematle, WA 6158 / AU | ||
For all designated states Celera Group 1401 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda CA 94502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAYER, David 36 Windsor Road East Fremantle, Western Australia 6158 / AU | 02 /
GOODRIDGE, Damian 37 Brighton Road Scarborough, Western Australia 6019 / AU | 03 /
HODGES, Steve 7 Corang Court Cloverdale, Western Australia 6105 / AU | 04 /
McGINNIS, Malcolm 1745 Oakdell Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
STEIN, Jason 431 PaIa Ave. Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | 06 /
KRAUSA, Peter 50 Van Buren Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/28] | Sundman, Patrik Christoffer, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/12] | Sundman, Patrik Christoffer Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07719048.6 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007AU00805 | Priority number, date | AU2006903136P | 09.06.2006 Original published format: AU 2006903136 P | AU2006904661P | 28.08.2006 Original published format: AU 2006904661 P | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140540 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2035578 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLS | [2009/12] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF A NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE | [2009/12] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'UNE MOLÉCULE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9216180 (SISKA DIAGNOSTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1; claim 1; table 2 * [I] 5-9,13-19; | WO9907883 [ ] (VISIBLE GENETICS INC [CA], et al); | [XI]WO03018835 (HVIDOVRE HOSPITAL [DK], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5-9,13-19; | [XI] - MIETZ J A ET AL, "INTRACISTERNAL A-PARTICLE-SPECIFIC OLIGONUCLEOTIDES PROVIDE MULTILOCUS PROBES FOR GENETIC LINKAGE STUDIES IN THE MOUSE", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1992), Database accession no. PREV199294095834, XP008116349 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 5-9,13-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00356154 | [ ] - MAMMALIAN GENOME, (1992), vol. 3, no. 8, ISSN 0938-8990, pages 447 - 451 | [I] - Geneseq, (19981016), Database accession no. AAV46230, URL: EBI, XP002560255 [I] 22 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO8803957 (GEN PROBE INC [US]); | [A]US5894492 (WELCH DAVID F [US], et al); | [A]WO9919509 (VISIBLE GENETICS INC [CA], et al); | [A]US6194147 (BAXTER-LOWE LEE ANN [US], et al); | [A] - ZENG Q.-Y. ET AL., "Development of mitochondrial SSU rDNA-based oligonucleotide probes for specific detection of common airborne fungi", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, (2003), vol. 17, pages 281 - 288, XP004471007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0890-8508(03)00067-7 | [A] - MARKS J.D. ET AL., "Oligonucleotide primers for polymerase chain reaction amplification of human immunoglobulin variable genes and design of family-specific oligonucleotide probes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 21, pages 985 - 991, XP000573176 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830210419 | Examination | - PAUL PHILIP ET AL, "HLA-DRB1* intron-primed sequencing for haploid genotyping", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20030401), vol. 49, no. 4, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 692 - 694, XP002582154 | - ADAMS SHARON D ET AL, "Ambiguous allele combinations in HLA Class I and Class II sequence-based typing: when precise nucleotide sequencing leads to imprecise allele identification", JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20040913), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1479-5876-2-30, ISSN 1479-5876, page 30, XP021009834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-2-30 | - ZHANG KUN ET AL, "HaploBlockFinder: haplotype block analyses", BIOINFORMATICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20030701), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1093/BIOINFORMATICS/BTG142, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1300 - 1301, XP002428372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btg142 | - PATEL S ET AL, "Common variations in the ALMS1 gene do not contribute to susceptibility to type 2 diabetes in a large white UK population.", DIABETOLOGIA JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 49, no. 6, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 1209 - 1213 | - ALLCOCK RICHARD J N ET AL, "High-Density SNP genotyping defines 17 distinct haplotypes of the TNF block in the Caucasian population: implications for haplotype tagging.", HUMAN MUTATION DEC 2004, (200412), vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 1098-1004, pages 517 - 525 |