EP2017976 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR JOINT-RELAYING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NI, Wei D301, Building NO. 3, 388 Ningqiao Road, Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Gang D301, Building NO. 3, 388 Ningqiao Road, Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Feng D301, Building NO. 3, 388 Ningqiao Road, Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Shan D301, Building NO. 3, 388 Ningqiao Road, Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07720823.9 | 17.04.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007CN01250 | Priority number, date | CN2006126260 | 29.04.2006 Original published format: CN200610026260 | [2009/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124670 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017976 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/15 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/15592 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04B7/2606 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBUNDWEITERLEITUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2009/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR JOINT-RELAYING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | [2009/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RELAIS CONJOINT DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2008 | Translation filed | 01.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 01.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005053338 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [X]WO2005120100 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005081427 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005067225 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]JP2003110478 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) |