EP2103546 - VACUUM PACKAGING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ding, Yaowu 118-26 Tong Jiang Road Taixing Jiangsu 225400 / CN | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07720910.4 | 23.04.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007CN01337 | Priority number, date | CN2007136218 | 04.01.2007 Original published format: CN200710036218 | [2009/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086668 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103546 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06, B65D81/20, B65D83/14 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B05B15/30 (EP,US);
B65D77/06 (KR);
B05B11/026 (EP,US);
B65D47/00 (KR);
B65D81/20 (KR);
B65D83/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VAKUUMVERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTER | [2009/39] | English: | VACUUM PACKAGING CONTAINER | [2009/39] | French: | RÉCIPIENT D'EMBALLAGE SOUS VIDE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2009 | Translation filed | 13.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 18.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 11.01.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0701951 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-3,5-10* column 6, line 29 - column 10, line 2; figures 2,8-29 *; | [I]JPH0948478 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [I] 1-3,5-10 * abstract *; | [I]JPH09328177 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [I] 1-3,5-10 * abstract *; | [XI]JPH10211961 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * [I] 7,9,10; | [XI]WO0004998 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 5; figures 2,3,4a,4b * [I] 7,9,10 | International search | [A]CN2333628Y (LI JIANZHONG [CN]); | [A]CN2338281Y (JI SHENQING [CN]); | [Y]CN2411991Y (CHENG WENPENG [CN]); | [Y]CN2481660Y (DAI YANG [CN]); | [A]GB2390670 (SCOTIA PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) | by applicant | JPH10211961 |