EP2076446 - DRINK BOTTLE WITH A PROMOTIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SD - IP Ltd s.r.o. Bozeny Nemcovej 8 81104 Bratislava / SK | [2018/35] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states SD - IP Ltd s.r.o. Bozeny Nemcovej 8 81104 Bratislava / SK | ||
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Dlouhy, Pavel Opavská 145 747 22 Dolní Benesov-Zábreh / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dlouhy, Pavel Opavská 145 747 22 Dolní Benesov-Zábreh / CZ | [2015/18] |
Former [2009/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2018/35] |
Former [2009/28] | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV, Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 07721815.4 | 10.04.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007CZ00026 | Priority number, date | CZ20060018046U | 31.08.2006 Original published format: CZ 200618046 U | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025301 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2076446 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2076446 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/12, B65D71/00 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
B65D23/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65D25/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/35] |
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEFLASCHE MIT WERBEOBJEKT | [2009/28] | English: | DRINK BOTTLE WITH A PROMOTIONAL OBJECT | [2009/28] | French: | BOUTEILLE POUR BOISSONS ACCOMPAGNÉE D'UN OBJET PROMOTIONNEL | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2014 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 06.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1018302 (FERRERO OHG [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2002120871 (MIMURA TETSUO, et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [XY]US2004226904 (SCHROEDER MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0047] - [0051] - [0058]; figure 10 * [Y] 2 | Examination | DE8715959U | WO9928201 | US6217294 | US2004004829 | EP1557369 |