24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
06.03.2020 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
21.02.2020 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
09.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.09.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.09.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
19.01.2018 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
17.01.2018 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
17.01.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
16.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
16.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
08.12.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.04.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
18.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
16.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
08.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] |
15.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
09.10.2015 |
Opposition filed |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
12.12.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.10.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.06.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.06.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.04.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.02.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
08.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
27.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
18.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
23.11.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
16.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2010 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.05.2009 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
27.02.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
10.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2009 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|