Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024246374 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213399038 | 17.02.2012 | US30202709 | 16.07.2009 | US202318125231 | 23.03.2023 | US202016920800 | 06.07.2020 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | US202418624359 | 02.04.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023226861 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213399038 | 17.02.2012 | US30202709 | 16.07.2009 | US202318125231 | 23.03.2023 | US202016920800 | 06.07.2020 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020331310 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213399038 | 17.02.2012 | US202016920800 | 06.07.2020 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | US30202707 | 23.05.2007 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009294006 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10723184 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2012211137 | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213399038 | 17.02.2012 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | US30202707 | 23.05.2007 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009537386 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2040943 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2015 | B1 | EP2040943 | 01.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2040943T | 20.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2534466T | 23.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2040943T | 31.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07721824 | 23.05.2007 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2040943T | 29.05.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07721824 | 23.05.2007 | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | WO2007CZ00035 | 23.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007134556 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5668173B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2015 | B2 | JP2015003730 | 08.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013100105 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101495331 | 29.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ303718 | 03.04.2013 | B6 | CZ2006335 | 05.12.2007 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE025181T | 29.02.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2040943E | 29.04.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | CZ2006335 | 23.05.2006 |