EP2040943 - A CHAMBER OF A PERISTALTIC PUMP FOR TIRE PRESSURE ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coda Innovations s.r.o. Kováku 1141/11 15000 Praha 5 / CZ | [2016/21] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Sithold, S.R.O. Kovaku 1141/11 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | ||
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Coda Development, S.r.o. Kováku° 114/11 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Coda Development, S.r.o. Kováku° 114/11 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | ||
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Coda Development, S.r.o. Kováku° 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | ||
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Coda Development, S.r.o. Taborska 438/51 14000 Praha 4 / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HRABAL, Frantisek Kovaku 1141/11 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | [2014/30] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
HRABAL, Frantisek Nezamyslova 274/10 12000 Praha 2 / CZ | Representative(s) | Rings, Rolf, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Kratochvil, Vaclav Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 26 295 01 Mnichovo Hradiste / CZ | ||
Former [2009/14] | Kratochvil, Vaclav Táborská 758/33 29301 Mladá Boleslav / CZ | Application number, filing date | 07721824.6 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007CZ00035 | Priority number, date | CZ20060000335 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: CZ 20060335 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007134556 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040943 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040943 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00, B60C15/024 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B60C15/06 (EP,US);
B60C23/123 (EP,US);
B60C23/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMMER EINER SCHLAUCHPUMPE ZUR REIFENDRUCKEINSTELLUNG | [2009/14] | English: | A CHAMBER OF A PERISTALTIC PUMP FOR TIRE PRESSURE ADJUSTMENT | [2009/14] | French: | CHAMBRE DE POMPE PÉRISTALTIQUE POUR LE RÉGLAGE DE PRESSION DE PNEU | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.2015
08.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 200 Innovation Way Akron OH 44316 / US Opponent's representative Kutsch, Bernd, et al, et al Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2015/46] | 16.11.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.02.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/15] | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 17.01.2018 | Appeal received No. T0155/18 | 21.03.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.02.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 04.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | AT | 23.05.2016 | GB | 23.05.2016 | IE | 23.05.2016 | PL | 23.05.2016 | RO | 23.05.2016 | SK | 23.05.2016 | TR | 23.05.2016 | ES | 24.05.2016 | HU | 24.05.2016 | SI | 24.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | DK | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | PT | 23.11.2016 | GR | 07.12.2016 | FI | 23.05.2017 | [2022/30] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
AT | 23.05.2016 | ||
GB | 23.05.2016 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
PL | 23.05.2016 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
ES | 24.05.2016 | ||
HU | 24.05.2016 | ||
SI | 24.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
DK | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | CY | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
AT | 23.05.2016 | ||
GB | 23.05.2016 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
PL | 23.05.2016 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
HU | 24.05.2016 | ||
SI | 24.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
DK | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 23.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CY | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
AT | 23.05.2016 | ||
GB | 23.05.2016 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
PL | 23.05.2016 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
HU | 24.05.2016 | ||
SI | 24.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
DK | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CY | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
AT | 23.05.2016 | ||
GB | 23.05.2016 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
HU | 24.05.2016 | ||
SI | 24.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
DK | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
AT | 23.05.2016 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
RO | 23.05.2016 | ||
SK | 23.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1050886 (WETHERELL ANSON B [US]); | [X]US1134361 (WETHERELL ANSON B [US]); | [XY]DE3433318 (MOUSIOL HANS [DE]); | [Y]WO2005012009 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | CS246152 | CS273325 | CZ20014451 | CZ20021364 |