EP2010865 - MEASURING THE PROFILE OF PIPE ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rattunde & Co GmbH Bauernallee 23 19288 Ludwigslust / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Rattunde & Co GmbH Buernallee 23 19288 Ludwigslust / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATTUNDE, Ulrich Dorfstr. 48a 19322 Bentwisch / DE | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Groth, Wieland Patentanwalt Zippelhaus 4 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Groth, Wieland Schopenstehl 22 20095 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Groth, Wieland Schopenstehl 22 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722230.5 | 17.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007DE00672 | Priority number, date | DE20061019354 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019354 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124717 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010865 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010865 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/20, G01B11/24, G01B5/00, G01B5/012 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G01B5/20 (EP,US);
B21B38/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROFILMESSUNG VON ROHRENDEN | [2009/02] | English: | MEASURING THE PROFILE OF PIPE ENDS | [2009/02] | French: | MESURE DE PROFIL D'EXTRÉMITÉS DE TUBE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2007 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | IE | 17.04.2014 | LU | 17.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.04.2007 | |
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4084324 (WHITEHOUSE DAVID JOHN) [Y] 2,13-16,18-21 * abstract * * figures 2,11 * * column 11, lines 18-39 * * claims 1,2,22,23 *; | [XY]DE4034702 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,12,17 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 33 * * claims 1,2,5,10,11 * [Y] 2,6-11,13-16,18-21; | [X]WO03008900 (WERTH MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7 * * claims 1-8 * * figure 4 *; | [Y]US6539642 (MORIYASU SEI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-11 * abstract * * figures 2-5,7b * * column 1, lines 9-67 * * column 2, lines 57-65 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 29 * * column 5, line 57 - column 8, line 62 * * column 12, lines 36-62 *; | [X]DE10258579 (CARL MAHR HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] - [0041] - [0063] , [0064] ** figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US2005235507 (BADAMI VIVEK G [US], et al) [Y] 2,13-16,18-21 * abstract * * figures 4-7 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0020] , [0041] , [0043] , [0048] - [0051] * * claims 1,23,27 *; | [E]US2007162255 (CHIU WEN-SSU [TW]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document * | Examination | DE2419698 | US5040306 | by applicant | DE2419698 | US5040306 | DE4034702 | US6539642 |