EP2027458 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPERATION OF AN MOX GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2011/27] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Thomas Putzbrunner Strasse 26 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
SAYHAN, Ilker August-Kühn-Str. 16 80339 München / DE | 03 /
SABATER, Jordi Pütrich Str. 4 81667 München / DE | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 07722373.3 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007DE00819 | Priority number, date | DE20061025249 | 29.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006025249 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137549 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027458 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027458 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
G01N27/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MOX-GAS-SENSORS | [2009/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE OPERATION OF AN MOX GAS SENSOR | [2009/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ DE COMBUSTIBLE MOX | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2007 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3123403 (SIEGAS METALLWARENFAB [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,11-16,19 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US5517182 (YASUNAGA SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XY]US5898101 (LYLE ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-16,19 * column 1, lines 12-53 * * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 6; figure 3 * [Y] 7,8,10,17,18,20; | [Y]US2003037593 (HATTORI AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8,17,18 * paragraph [0007]; example 2 *; | [Y]US2005022581 (SUNSHINE STEVEN A [US]) [Y] 10,20 * abstract * | Examination | WO9852036 | by applicant | DE3123403 | US5898101 | US2003037593 | US2005022581 |