EP2024093 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING VERY FINE PARTICLES BY MEANS OF A JET MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netzsch-Condux Mahltechnik Gmbh Gebrüder-Netzsch-Str. 19 95100 Selb / DE | For all designated states Nied, Roland, Dr.-Ing. Raiffeisenstrasse 10 86486 Bonstetten / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIED, Roland Raiffeisenstrasse 10 86486 Bonstetten / DE | 02 /
SICKEL, Hermann Obergasse 25 35516 Münzenberg / DE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Kaflerstrasse 15 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger Seeger Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Lindner, Manfred Klaus Patentanwälte Walter . Eggers . Lindner Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722451.7 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007DE00903 | Priority number, date | DE20061023193 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006023193 | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131502 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024093 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024093 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/06, B02C23/10, B07B7/083 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B02C19/06 (EP,US);
B02C23/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG FEINSTER PARTIKEL MITTELS EINER STRAHLMÜHLE | [2009/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING VERY FINE PARTICLES BY MEANS OF A JET MILL | [2009/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE TRÈS FINES PARTICULES AU MOYEN D'UN BROYEUR À JET FLUIDE | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 03.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IE | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | MT | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | LU | 18.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
LU | 18.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
LU | 18.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
LU | 18.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1481304 (BOC INTERNATIONAL LTD) [A] 1-9 * sentences 35-45; claim 2 *; | [A]EP0211117 (RMD IND INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * columns 4,5 *; | [A]DE3620440 (INDUTEC INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0472930 (NIED ROLAND [DE]) [AD] 10-13* abstract * |