Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
12.06.2009 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
12.06.2009 | Change - inventor | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
15.05.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
15.05.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
03.04.2009 | Change - designated states | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
03.04.2009 | Change - extension states | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
31.03.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
18.03.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.01.2009 | Change - inventor | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
12.12.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.11.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.11.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
11.09.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.09.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.11.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.11.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.10.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication |