Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8113975 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2012 | B2 | US2009275434 | 05.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP00069 | 05.01.2007 | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5121819B | Global Dossier | 16.01.2013 | B2 | JP2009533616 | 17.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP00069 | 05.01.2007 | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2005035 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2009 | B1 | EP2005035 | 24.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP00069 | 05.01.2007 | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101466969B | 21.09.2011 | B | CN101466969 | 24.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP00069 | 05.01.2007 | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502007001082D1 | 27.08.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP00069 | 05.01.2007 | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007118519 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101040326B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2011 | B1 | KR20090008334 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006017247 | 18.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006017247 | 12.04.2006 |