EP2005035 - CHAIN WHEEL AND TIMING CHAIN DRIVE FOR THE COMPENSATION OF DYNAMIC LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iwis motorsysteme GmbH & Co. KG Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 53 81369 München / DE | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RITZ, Andreas Gmunder Str. 5 81379 München / DE | 02 /
WELKE, Lutz Gerolfinger Str. 94 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | 03 /
HIRSCHMANN, Volker Zeilstrasse 4a 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
RITZ, Andreas Gmunder Strasse 5 81379 München / DE | ||
02 /
WELKE, Lutz Gerolfinger Str. 94 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
03 /
HIRSCHMANN, Volker Zeilstrasse 4a 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | |||
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
RITZ, Andreas Heimeranstr. 34 80339 München / DE | ||
02 /
WELKE, Lutz Gerolfinger Str. 94 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
03 /
HIRSCHMANN, Volker Zeilstrasse 4a 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722746.0 | 05.01.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP00069 | Priority number, date | DE20061017247 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006017247 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007118519 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005035 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005035 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/30 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
F16H55/30 (EP,KR,US);
F16H7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/19] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KETTENRAD UND STEUERKETTENTRIEB ZUR KOMPENSATION DYNAMISCHER BELASTUNGEN | [2008/52] | English: | CHAIN WHEEL AND TIMING CHAIN DRIVE FOR THE COMPENSATION OF DYNAMIC LOADS | [2008/52] | French: | ROUE DENTÉE À CHAÎNE ET COMMANDE PAR CHAÎNE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR LA COMPENSATION DE CONTRAINTES DYNAMIQUES | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 13.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4227422 (KAWASHIMA YOSHINORI, et al) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 24 - line 43; figure 3 *; | [DA]EP1184593 (RENOLD PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,2,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003176251 (HAMILTON JEFFREY R [US]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0029] *; | [A]WO03081084 (CLOYES GEAR & PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]WO03046413 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE [CA]) [A] 1,12,16 * page 3, line 24 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE20220367U (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE WOODBRIDGE [CA]); | [A]DE102004027064 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1,12,16 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE3739336 | DE3920528 | DE19520508 | JPH10266868 | DE20220367U | DE20319172U | EP0097041 | EP1208646 | JPS61171942 | WO03093700 |