EP2004377 - COMPRESSION MOULDING FLUFFY CELLULOSIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paper Technologies S.R.L. Via Privata Cesare Battisti, 1 20122 Milano / IT | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGHILERI, Gianmario Paper Technologies S.r.l. Via Privata Cesare Battisti, 1 I-20122 Milano / IT | 02 /
NYBOM, Lars, Goran Betesvägen 4 S-616 90 Aby / SE | [2011/38] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
ANGHILERI, Gianmario Paper Technologies S.r.l. Via Privata Cesare Battisti, 1 I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
NYBOM, Lars, Goran Betesvägen 4 S-616 90 Aby / SE | Representative(s) | Ponzellini, Gian-Marco PGA S.p.A. PLS See message P.Soeteway in File 00940761.0 - Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/39] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31 20154 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/34] | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio, et al BUGNION S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/52] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07722977.1 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP01724 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00447 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060447 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104431 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004377 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2004377 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/00, B29C51/14, B65D1/34 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B29C43/003 (EP,US);
B29C33/10 (EP,US);
B29C43/203 (EP,US);
B29C51/145 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7404 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | 08.10.2008 | BA | 08.10.2008 | HR | 08.10.2008 | MK | 08.10.2008 | RS | 08.10.2008 | Title | German: | FORMPRESSEN VON FLOCKIGEM ZELLULOSEMATERIAL | [2008/52] | English: | COMPRESSION MOULDING FLUFFY CELLULOSIC MATERIAL | [2008/52] | French: | MATÉRIAU CELLULOSIQUE DUVETEUX POUR MOULAGE PAR COMPRESSION | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 26.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2007 | AT | 21.09.2011 | BE | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | IE | 28.02.2012 | LU | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2012 | ||
LU | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]BE665468 (KEYES FIBRE COMPANY) [A] 1,15,16 * page 8 - page 11; figure 4 *; | [A]DE4313334 (LINPAC TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 3, line 54 - page 5, line 45; figure - *; | [X]EP0621188 (SILVER PLASTICS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-29 * page 6, column L, line 49 - page 7, column L, line 26; figures 4-6 *; | [DA]WO0242070 (NYBOMS INGENJOERER AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1-29 * page 11, line 12 - page 13, line 31; figure - * | by applicant | US4337116 | EP0621188 | WO9719803 |