EP2002475 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR MIKROELEKTRONIK STUTTGART Allmandring 30a 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGHARTZ, Joachim, N. Teckstrasse 3 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Martin Haeberlinstr. 19 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
APPEL, Wolfgang Richard-Wagner Str. 40 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2008/51] | Duhme, Torsten, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723044.9 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007EP01886 | Priority number, date | DE20061013419 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013419 | DE20061059394 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059394 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104443 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2002475 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002475 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/78, H01L21/304, H01L21/02 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/7813 (EP,US);
H01L21/78 (KR);
H01L21/02002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H01L21/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNG | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2008/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 06.08.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2007 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MT | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2007 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MT | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2823596 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,3,8,11 * abstract * * page 39 - page 41 *; | [A]US6774010 (CHU JACK OON [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 67 *; | [A]DE10019705 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 4-7,11 * figure - * | by applicant | US2005029224 | DE4029973 | WO2005104223 | US6165813 | US6521068 | JP2002299500 | DE19752208 | US6774010 | DE10019705 | - OVERSTOLZ ET AL., "A Clean Wafer-Scale Chip-Release Process without Dicing Based on Vapor Phase Etching", 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, (200401), pages 717 - 720 | - ARMBRUSTER ET AL., "Surface Micromachining of Monocrystalline Silicon Membranes Using a Silicon Micro Grid of Sintered Porous Silicon", TECHNICAL DIGEST OF EUROSENSORS XVIII, (20040912), page 22,23 |