EP1999832 - ARRANGEMENT FOR SERVING AT LEAST ONE CABLE CORE OF AN ELECTRICAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nkt cables GmbH & Co. KG Düsseldorfer Str. 400 DE-51061 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states nkt cables GmbH Schanzenstrasse 6-20 51063 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASCHK, Volker Scherfbachtalstr. 57 51519 Odental / DE | [2008/50] | Application number, filing date | 07723165.2 | 10.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007EP02113 | Priority number, date | DE20061013553 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013553 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110145 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1999832 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1999832 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
H02G3/0481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, NL [2011/30] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM UMHÜLLEN VON MINDESTENS EINER KABELADER EINES ELEKTRISCHEN KABELS | [2008/50] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR SERVING AT LEAST ONE CABLE CORE OF AN ELECTRICAL CABLE | [2008/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ENVELOPPER AU MOINS UN FIL D'UN CABLE ELECTRIQUE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 27.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1486445 (SUPERFLEXIT) [A] 1,5-7 * page 1, line 89 - page 2, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE3123040 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0536541 (BESMA BESCHICHTUNGSMASSEN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0750378 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]FR2812465 (RUBANS GALLANT [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document * |