EP2001546 - CLOSABLE MALE LUER CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2013/38] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Nippon Covidien Limited 27-7, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | ||
For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | |||
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 27-7, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | ||
For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | |||
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 27-7, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tyco HealthCare Group AG Viktor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | |||
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 27-7, Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | ||
For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANI, Ichiro Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | 02 /
FUNAMURA, Shigeaki Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Yosuke c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | 04 /
FUJIWARA, Norifumi Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | [2015/45] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
KITANI, Ichiro Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | ||
02 /
FUNAMURA, Shigeaki Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd. 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Yosuke c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIWARA, Norifumi Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | |||
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
KITANI, Ichiro Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui City Shizuoka Pref. / JP | ||
02 /
FUNAMURA, Shigeaki Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui city Shizuoka Pref. / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Yosuke c/o Nippon Sherwood Medical Industries Ltd 10-2 Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8615 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIWARA, Norifumi Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui City Shizuoka Pref. / JP | |||
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
KITANI, Ichiro Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui City Shizuoka Pref. / JP | ||
02 /
FUNAMURA, Shigeaki Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui city Shizuoka Pref. / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Yosuke Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui City Shizuoka Pref. / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIWARA, Norifumi Nippon Sherwood 1217-1, Tomonaga Nukui City Shizuoka Pref. / JP | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2008/51] | Olsson, Carl H.S. Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 CH-8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 07723772.5 | 29.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007EP02830 | Priority number, date | JP20060102094 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006102094 | JP20060350893 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006350893 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112944 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2001546 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2001546 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/26, A61M5/165 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
A61M2039/268 (EP,US);
A61M2205/7536 (EP,US);
A61M5/165 (EP,US);
A61M5/38 (EP,US);
A61M5/385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLIESSBARER LUER-STECKER | [2008/51] | English: | CLOSABLE MALE LUER CONNECTOR | [2008/51] | French: | RACCORD LUER MALE REFERMABLE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12193189.3 / EP2561901 | EP13156792.7 / EP2599519 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2007 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | IE | 29.03.2016 | LU | 29.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.03.2007 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 29.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.03.2007 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 29.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 29.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 29.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0268480 (PHARMACIA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25* column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 45 *; | [X]US2004124389 (PHILLIPS JOHN C [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0048] - [0073]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]WO2005065767 (VASOGEN IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 5, line 20 - page 12, line 10; figures 2-12 *; | [PX]WO2006062912 (CARDINAL HEALTH 303 INC [US]) [PX] 1-25 * paragraph [0049]; figures 1-11 *; | [PX]WO2006074935 (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007008511 (ICU MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-25 * paragraphs [0105] - [0117]; figures 8,9 * |