EP2002089 - PISTON STEAM ENGINE HAVING INTERNAL FLASH VAPOURISATION OF A WORKING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electricité de France, Société Anonyme 22-30 avenue de Wagram 75008 Paris / FR | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖFFLER, Michael Ludowiciring 13c 76751 Jockgrim / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/51] | Hellwig, Tillmann Johannes Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723993.7 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007EP03052 | Priority number, date | DE20061015754 | 04.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006015754 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007115769 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002089 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002089 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01K21/02, F01K25/08, F22B27/00, F22B27/16, F01B17/04 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
F01K21/02 (EP,US);
F02B75/26 (KR);
F01B5/00 (KR);
F01K25/08 (EP,US);
F22B27/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLBENDAMPFMASCHINE MIT INTERNER FLASH-VERDAMPFUNG DES ARBEITSMEDIUMS | [2008/51] | English: | PISTON STEAM ENGINE HAVING INTERNAL FLASH VAPOURISATION OF A WORKING MEDIUM | [2008/51] | French: | MACHINE À VAPEUR À PISTON, À ÉVAPORATION ÉCLAIR INTERNE DU FLUIDE DE TRAVAIL | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2007 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MT | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | AT | 04.04.2016 | IE | 04.04.2016 | LU | 04.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 23.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GB | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | DE | 01.11.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
DE | 01.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB171291 (WALTER IRVING HOOVER) [X] 1,8-10,13-15 * page 1 - page 3 *; | [X]US3720188 (MEAD G) [X] 1,2,8,10,13-15 * figures 1,3,7 * * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 7, line 60 *; | [Y]FR2258520 (BOEHLER & CO AG GEB [AT]) [Y] 5-7 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4301655 (THOMAS LUTHER B) [X] 1,2,8,10,13-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 9 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,5-7,11,12; | [X]GB2082683 (THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1,8,9,13-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 50 *; | [Y]JPH06117256 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0787900 (WAERTSILAE DIESEL INT [FI]) [Y] 5-7* column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 20 *; | [XY]DE10000082 (FRANK GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-15 * figures 1,4,7,8 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 15 * * abstract * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]DE10062835 (SCHNEIDER ERICH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * |