EP2021090 - METHOD FOR SWITCHING POINTS IN A DIGITAL CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRACK-GUIDED TOY VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stadlbauer Marketing + Vertrieb GmbH Rennbahn Allee 1 5412 Puch/Salzburg / AT | [2011/10] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Stadlbauer Spiel- und Freizeitartikel GmbH Südwestpark 94 90449 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAASS, Uwe Verdistrasse 31c 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
MISSLER, Roman Untere Dell 17 66822 Lebach / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 02 37 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Zeitler - Volpert - Kandlbinder Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724311.1 | 17.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP03374 | Priority number, date | DE20061023131 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006023131 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131588 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021090 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021090 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63H18/16, A63H19/32 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A63H18/023 (EP,US);
A63H18/025 (EP,US);
A63H19/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHALTEN VON WEICHEN IN EINEM DIGITALEN STEUERSYSTEM FÜR SPURGEFÜHRTE FAHRSPIELZEUGE | [2009/07] | English: | METHOD FOR SWITCHING POINTS IN A DIGITAL CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TRACK-GUIDED TOY VEHICLES | [2009/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION D'AIGUILLAGES DE VOIES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE POUR VÉHICULES JOUETS GUIDÉS | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2007 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MT | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | IE | 17.04.2016 | LU | 17.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 17.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 17.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 11.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE20315048U (WANY S A [FR]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0047] - [0066]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2003155470 (YOUNG NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0050] - [0060] * * paragraph [0131]; figures 1-22 *; | [A]DE3618530 (DOEHLER PETER DIPL KAUFM [DE]) | by applicant | DE20315048U | US2003155470 | DE3618530 |