|
09.04.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Communication regarding Amendments not taken into account |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.07.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2008 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.07.2008 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2008 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.02.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
01.11.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |