EP2012964 - EXPANSION TOOL FOR COLD EXPANSION OF HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316, Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖLCKEN, Piet Außer der Schleifmühle 27 28203 Bremen / DE | 02 /
REESE, Eggert, D. St.-Georg-Str. 1f 85667 Oberpframmern / DE | 03 /
JONES, Thomthy, G., B. L'Esteque F-32600 Aurade. Gers / FR | [2016/37] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
WÖLCKEN, Piet Außer de Schleifmühle 27 28203 Bremen / DE | ||
02 /
REESE, Eggert, D St.-Georg-Str. 1f 85667 Oberpframmern / DE | |||
03 /
JONES, Thomthy, G., B. L'Esteque F-32600 Aurade. Gers / FR | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
WÖLCKEN, Piet Hermann-Heye-Str. 29 28199 Bremen / DE | ||
02 /
REESE, Eggert, D St.-Georg-Str. 1f 85667 Oberpframmern / DE | |||
03 /
JONES, Thomthy, G., B. L'Esteque F-32600 Aurade. Gers / FR | Representative(s) | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Bonnans, Arnaud Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07724401.0 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007EP03464 | Priority number, date | DE20061019405 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019405 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007121932 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2012964 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2012964 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23P9/02 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B23P9/025 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4994 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 20.11.2008 | BA | 20.11.2008 | HR | 20.11.2008 | MK | 20.11.2008 | RS | 20.11.2008 | Title | German: | AUFWEITWERKZEUG ZUM KALTAUFWEITEN VON LÖCHERN | [2009/03] | English: | EXPANSION TOOL FOR COLD EXPANSION OF HOLES | [2009/03] | French: | OUTIL D'EXPANSION POUR L'EXPANSION À FROID DE TROUS | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11176749.7 / EP2457687 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2007 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | IE | 20.04.2017 | LU | 20.04.2017 | MT | 20.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1611976 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] - [0022]; figures 3-11 *; | [X]US2943667 (WAYNE EWING, et al) [X] 1-10,13,15 * column 1, line 15 - line 29 * * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 68 * * figures 1,2,1a *; | [X]US2672175 (HOWARD RUSSELL B) [X] 1-10,13-15 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 26; figure - *; | [DA]US3892121 (CHAMPOUX LOUIS A, et al) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0131648 (FATIGUE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0581385 (FATIGUE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US3677684 |