EP2145295 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING SHIPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Post AG Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 20 53113 Bonn / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAXENA, Ashish 30, StrudeeRoad 11-06 Kerrisdale Condo 207852 Singapore / SG | 02 /
PATWARDHAN, Supriya Rao Holbeinstrasse 11 53175 Bonn / DE | [2010/12] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
SAXENA, Ashish 30, StrudeeRoad 11-06 Kerrisdale Condo 207852 Singapore / SG | ||
02 /
PATWARDHAN, Supriya Rao A01, Bintan Pantai Condo 88-Jalan Bukit Pantai Kuala Lumpur Malaysia 59100 / MY | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724681.7 | 27.04.2007 | [2010/03] | WO2007EP03754 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131791 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145295 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES VERSANDS | [2010/03] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FACILITATING SHIPPING | [2010/03] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUES FACILITANT L'EXPÉDITION DE MARCHANDISES. | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | 11.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2013 | 07.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |