EP2142703 - USE OF AN ADDITIVE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DECORATIVE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munksjoe Paper, S.A. B[deg] Eldua 20492 Beràstegui / ES | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGIBURU, Jose, Luis Lurre 4, 5 D E-20400 Tolosa / ES | 02 /
NAVALPOTRO, Juan, Antonio Kondeko Aldapa, 20 E-20400 Tolosa / ES | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roedern, Giso, et al Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2010/02] | Application number, filing date | 07724729.4 | 30.04.2007 | [2010/02] | WO2007EP03802 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131793 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142703 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/26, D21H17/53, D21H19/60, D21H19/62 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
D21H27/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/53 (EP,US);
D21H19/60 (EP,US);
D21H19/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES ADDITIVS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DEKORPAPIER | [2010/02] | English: | USE OF AN ADDITIVE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DECORATIVE PAPER | [2010/02] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN ADDITIF DANS LA PRODUCTION D'UN PAPIER DE DÉCORATION | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3539444 (SCHNEIDER ERNST, et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - line 27 * * example 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [XY]GB1221976 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1,13 * page 2, line 49 - line 52 * * page 3, line 61 - line 65 * * claim 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 1; | [A]GB1497916 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG) [A] 1,13* the whole document *; | [Y]GB1524907 (ISOVOLTA) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 84 - line 89 * * example . *; | [X]JPH05293894 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * abstract * |