EP2040562 - PROCESS FOR SEPARATING PROTEINS FROM LIQUID MEDIA USING THERMALLY MODIFIED CLAY MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Süd-Chemie AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOHLING, Ulrich Alte Poststr. 49 85356 Freising / DE | 02 /
GERLEIGNER, Alfred Kiefergartenstrasse 35 80939 München / DE | 03 /
STÜTZER, Albert Herzog-Ferdinand-Strasse 1 85456 Wartenberg / DE | 04 /
RIECHERS, Daniel Pestalozzistr. 13 30451 Hannover / DE | 05 /
KASPER, Cornelia Theodorstr. 8 30159 Hannover / DE | 06 /
SCHEPER, Thomas Lange-Hop-Str. 47B 30559 Hannover / DE | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
SOHLING, Ulrich Alte Poststr. 49 85356 Freising / DE | ||
02 /
GERLEIGNER, Alfred Kiefergartenstrasse 35 80939 München / DE | |||
03 /
STÜTZER, Albert Preysingstrasse 29a 85465 Langenpreising / DE | |||
04 /
RIECHERS, Daniel Pestalozzistr. 13 30451 Hannover / DE | |||
05 /
KASPER, Cornelia Theodorstr. 8 30159 Hannover / DE | |||
06 /
SCHEPER, Thomas Lange-Hop-Str. 47B 30559 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | Rembold, Hansjörg Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [2009/28] |
Former [2009/14] | Westendorp, Michael Oliver Patentanwälte Splanemann Baronetzky Westendorp Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725371.4 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP04463 | Priority number, date | DE20061023822 | 20.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006023822 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007134816 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040562 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040562 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/00, A23L2/78, A23L2/80, C12C7/14, C12G1/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
A23L2/78 (EP);
A23J1/00 (EP);
A23L2/80 (EP);
C07K1/18 (EP);
C12H1/0408 (EP);
C12H1/0432 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2300/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON PROTEINEN AUS FLÜSSIGEN MEDIEN UNTER VERWENDUNG THERMISCH MODIFIZIERTER TONMATERIALIEN | [2009/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR SEPARATING PROTEINS FROM LIQUID MEDIA USING THERMALLY MODIFIED CLAY MATERIALS | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE PROTÉINES DE MILIEUX LIQUIDES PAR UTILISATION DE MATÉRIAUX ARGILEUX MODIFIÉS THERMIQUEMENT | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | MT | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | LU | 18.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
LU | 18.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
LU | 18.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE1160812 (KARL RAIBLE DR, et al) [AD] 1-16 * example 4 *; | [A]DE3633324 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0889004 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US5869415 (ORTIZ JOSE ANTONIO [MX], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | RU2209824 [ ] (OOO ALT [RU], et al); | [XP]WO2006097326 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1-16 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph 4 - page 19, paragraph 2; examples 2,3,8; claims 1-22 *; | [E]WO2007073893 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-16 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 6; claims 1-17 *; | [A] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:789300, URL: STN, XP002459231 [A] 1-16 * column A * |