EP2021849 - CABLE SLEEVE FOR THE STRUCTURED STORAGE AND HANDLING OF OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES GUIDED IN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology, Inc. 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUWE, Wolf Peter Hochstrasse 29 58638 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
SYPLAC, Roman Grimmestrasse 9a 58099 Hagen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Thorsten Primelweg 7 58708 Menden / DE | 04 /
LAPP, Oliver Ommerbornweg 20 42399 Wuppertal / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725385.4 | 19.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP04477 | Priority number, date | DE20062008655U | 30.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008655 U | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137717 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021849 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H02G15/013, H02G15/076 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H02G15/076 (EP,US);
G02B6/4444 (EP,US);
H02G15/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | KABELMUFFE ZUR STRUKTURIERTEN ABLAGE BZW. HANDHABUNG VON IN LICHTWELLENLEITERKABELN GEFÜHRTEN LICHTWELLENLEITERN | [2009/07] | English: | CABLE SLEEVE FOR THE STRUCTURED STORAGE AND HANDLING OF OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES GUIDED IN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE CABLES | [2009/07] | French: | MANCHON DE CABLE POUR LA DEPOSE OU LA MANIPULATION STRUCTUREE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES PASSANT DANS DES CABLES A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2748867 (ALCATEL CABLE INTERFACE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9326069 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al); | [DA]WO9222114 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP0841734 (PSI PRODUCTS GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9808125 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al); | [A]WO9956370 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE], et al) |