EP2148563 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING VOLUME DURING TRANSFER OF A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARTEC BENKE GmbH Borsigstrasse 10 21465 Reinbek/Hamburg / DE | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Bartec GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 16 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHM, Alfred Waldfrieden 12 94234 Viechtach / DE | 02 /
BINDER, Wilhelm Gotting 8 94113 Tiefenbach / DE | 03 /
LERACH, Dieter Gernfelderweg 2 94227 Zwiesel / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Heim, Hans-Karl, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725435.7 | 22.05.2007 | [2010/05] | WO2007EP04535 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141664 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148563 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2148563 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/01 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
A01J5/01 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MENGENBESTIMMUNG BEI DER ÜBERGABE EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2010/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING VOLUME DURING TRANSFER OF A LIQUID | [2010/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE QUANTITÉS LORS DU TRANSFERT D'UN LIQUIDE | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2007 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | LV | 20.07.2011 | MT | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2240764 (ARDILL ROBERT HENRY, et al) [X] 1-8,12-15,17-19,21-23 * page 15; figures 1,2; claims 1,6-9,12 * * page 3, line 3 - line 7 * * page 9, line 4 - page 11, line 14 *; | [X]GB2327219 (DANSK MEJERI ELEKTRONIK A S [DK]) [X] 1-7,10,12,13,15,17-19,21 * page 7, line 9 - line 16; figure 1; claims 5-7,11 *; | [DA]DE29623713U (JANSKY GMBH [DE]) [DA] 13,17,19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02103324 (BARTEC LOGISTIC MAN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,17* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19710296 | EP0855576 | DE29623713U | DE102005005295 |