EP2027044 - CURVED BELT CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caljan Rite-Hite ApS Ved Milepaelen 6-8 8361 Hasselager / DK | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNING, Uwe, B. Henri-Dunant-Strasse 70 31141 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
GRUTZA, Bernd Bernwardstrasse 10 30519 Hannover / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Niederkofler, Oswald, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Niederkofler, Oswald, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Wagner, Carsten, et al Leine Wagner Dr. Herrguth Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725477.9 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP04577 | Priority number, date | DE20061024536 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006024536 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007134854 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027044 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027044 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/02, B65G21/06 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B65G15/02 (EP,US);
B65G21/06 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | KURVENGURTFÖRDERER | [2009/09] | English: | CURVED BELT CONVEYOR | [2009/09] | French: | CONVOYEUR À BANDE COURBE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2007 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | IE | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | GB | 23.05.2012 | LU | 23.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
LU | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
GB | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19535757 (TRANSNORM SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13,14* the whole document *; | [X]JP2001122413 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-14 * abstract *; | [X]US2004035685 (FUJIWARA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12-14 * page 3, paragraph 32 - page 5, paragraph 45 * * figures 1-12 *; | [X]JP2005008376 (SANKI ENG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14 * abstract * |