Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009539785 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | WO2007EP04764 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2029516 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B1 | EP2029516 | 04.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | WO2007EP04764 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0712418 | 04.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | WO2007EP04764 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2029516T | 16.11.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | WO2007EP04764 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2551013T | 13.11.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | WO2007EP04764 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007140908 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007287855 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090018938 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101466661 | 24.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006027089 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200812959 | 16.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006027089 | 08.06.2006 |