EP2029516 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING FLUORINATED MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLER, Thomas Mutzbroicher Strasse 22 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
LUI, Norbert Am Geus Garten 2 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725655.0 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007EP04764 | Priority number, date | DE20061027089 | 08.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006027089 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007140908 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029516 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2029516 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/32, C07C69/63, C07C68/02, C07C69/96 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
C07C67/32 (EP,US);
C07C67/307 (KR);
C07C68/02 (EP,US);
C07C69/63 (KR);
C07C69/96 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/32, C07C69/63 (EP,US);
C07C68/02, C07C69/96 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORIERTEN MOLEKÜLEN | [2009/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING FLUORINATED MOLECULES | [2009/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MOLÉCULES FLUORÉES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 01.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2007 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1493194 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1,9,10 * claim - * * example - *; | [A]DE2542251 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [A] 1,9,10* page 50; example 141 *; | [DA]EP0163435 (ICI PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,9,10 * example - *; | [DA]WO2006037887 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [DA] 1,9,10 * page 11 *; | [X] - YAGUPOL'SKII, L. M. ET AL, "Perfluoroalkoxyacetic acids and their derivatives", UKRAINSKII KHIMICHESKII ZHURNAL (RUSSIAN EDITION) , 44(10), 1057-9 CODEN: UKZHAU; ISSN: 0041-6045, (1978), XP008083280 [X] 11,12 * page 52; compound I * | [DA] - FLOSSER D A ET AL, "A useful conversion of alcohols to alkyl fluorides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020603), vol. 43, no. 23, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4275 - 4279, XP004354692 [DA] 1,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)00738-4 |