EP2124923 - USE OF A POLYPHENOL IN THE TREATMENT OF THE METABOLIC SYNDROME AND ENDOTHELIAL DYSFUNCTION OR OTHER VASCULAR SEQUELLAE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagination Unlimited B.V. Wolfhezerweg 11 6761 AA Oosterbeek / NL | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Heezius, Anke E. Life Sciences Legal Advocaten B.V. Frans van Mierisstraat 55/11 1070 RK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/49] | Heezius, Anke E. SteinhauserVandenBrinkHeeziusRijsdijk Advocaten Strawinskylaan 1347 NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07725896.0 | 07.06.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007EP05050 | Priority number, date | EP20060076180 | 07.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06076180 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007141026 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124923 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61K36/87, A61K36/73, A61K36/45, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61K36/33, A61K131/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61K36/33 (EP,US);
A23L19/00 (EP,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K36/45 (EP,US);
A61K36/73 (EP,US);
A61K36/87 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/33, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/45, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/73, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES POLYPHENOLS BEI DER BEHANDLUNG DES METABOLISCHEN SYNDROMS UND VON ENDOTHEL-DYSFUNKTION ODER ANDEREN VASKULÄREN FOLGEN | [2009/49] | English: | USE OF A POLYPHENOL IN THE TREATMENT OF THE METABOLIC SYNDROME AND ENDOTHELIAL DYSFUNCTION OR OTHER VASCULAR SEQUELLAE. | [2009/49] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN POLYPHÉNOL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME MÉTABOLIQUE ET D'UN DYSFONCTIONNEMENT ENDOTHÉLIAL OU D'AUTRES SÉQUELLES VASCULAIRES | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Appeal following examination | 26.09.2012 | Appeal received No. T0320/13 | 06.12.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.05.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 17.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2009 | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2010 | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2011 | 30.06.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.2012 | 30.06.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]EP1640001 (NEW PHARMA INVEST HOLDING [LU]) [DX] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0020] * * claims 4-13,17,19,20,24,26,27 * * table 1 * [Y] 1-13; | [PXY]WO2006083666 (A M TODD COMPANY [US], et al) [PX] 1-8,10-13 * claims 1,4,27,31 * * page 24, line 92 * * claims 1,4,6 * [PY] 9; | [Y]WO2004028469 (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *; | [DXY]DE20304752U (WEBER & WEBER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DX] 11-13 * page 15, lines 1-11 * * page 8, columns 19-28 * * examples 26,27 * [Y] 1-13; | [YD]EP1586244 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-13 * table 1 * * claims 1-8 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 43 *; | [DXY]WO2005099483 (VENTURI DAVID [CA], et al) [DX] 1-8,11-13 * claims 1,4,5,14 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * [Y] 1-11,9; | [PX]WO2007038685 (CONSTELLATION BRANDS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,9-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007038768 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,9-13 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO02082930 (BIO SERAE LABORATOIRES [FR], et al) [DY] 5,6,8,10,11 * claims 25-30 * | [Y] - MORGAN ET AL, "Effects of Dietary Omega-3 Fatty Acid Supplementation on Endothelium-Dependent Vasodilation in Patients With Chronic Heart Failure", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO., NEWTON, MA,, US, (20060215), vol. 97, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9149, pages 547 - 551, XP005281267 [Y] 5-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2005.08.075 | Examination | - ZENEBE W ET AL, "PROTECTIVE EFFECTS OF RED WINE POLYPHENOLIC COMPOUNDS ON THE CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM", EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL CARDIOLOGY, PULSUS GROUP, OAKVILLE, CA, (20010921), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1205-6626, pages 153 - 158, XP001180037 | - BROEKHUIZEN LYSETTE N ET AL, "Reduction of monocyte chemoattractant protein 1 and macrophage migration inhibitory factor by a polyphenol-rich extract in subjects with clustered cardiometabolic risk factors.", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION NOV 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21733322, (201111), vol. 106, no. 9, ISSN 1475-2662, pages 1416 - 1422 | other | - "Nuskha Rubb-e-Seb", TKDL, Database accession no. JA7/150, XP003027356 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1887), vol. III, page 86 | - "Nuskha-e-dawa", TKDL, Database accession no. AH3/4005, XP003027357 | - AKLI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, Kaamil-al-Sena'ah, (2005), vol. II, page 409 | - "Nushka-e-Aanaar Bara-e-Ziabetus", TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/1453C, XP003027358 | - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1967), page 273 | - "Majoon Nukra", TKDL, Database accession no. RS22/1022, XP003027359 | - Rasatantrasarah Evam Siddhaprayogasamgrahah, (1990), vol. I, pages 800 - 801 |